VA HB1973 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1973
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of banquet licensees. Provides that banquet licensees that are nonprofit corporations or associations conducting fundraisers and that are authorized to sell wine, as part of any fundraising activity, in closed containers for off-premises consumption to persons to whom wine may be lawfully sold may, if conducting such fundraiser through an online meeting platform, ship such wine, in accordance with the regulations of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, in closed containers to persons located within the Commonwealth.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of banquet licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 182 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1973ER) |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100618D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1973 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)