VA HB1973 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of banquet licensees. Provides that banquet licensees that are nonprofit corporations or associations conducting fundraisers and that are authorized to sell wine, as part of any fundraising activity, in closed containers for off-premises consumption to persons to whom wine may be lawfully sold may, if conducting such fundraiser through an online meeting platform, ship such wine, in accordance with the regulations of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, in closed containers to persons located within the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of banquet licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-24HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100618D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
41209(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback