VA HB1973 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Historical African American cemeteries; Pulaski County. Adds two cemeteries in Pulaski County to the list of cemeteries for which qualified organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves. The cemeteries are the New River Cemetery, which contains 33 eligible graves, and the West Dublin Cemetery, which contains 44 eligible graves.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historical African American cemeteries; adds two cemeteries in Pulaski County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 184 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1973ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103745D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012211.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1973
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1973+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1973ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0184+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0015+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0027+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2146+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2220+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0111+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0351+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1973+HB1973
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1973+HB1973

Bill Comments

feedback