VA HB1973 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic Development Access Program; bonded projects. Imposes a 48-month moratorium on the repayment of funds allocated to a locality for a bonded project pursuant to the Economic Development Access Program, provided that the conditions of the Commonwealth Transportation Board's economic development access policy are met. The bill has an emergency clause and is identical to SB 1591.
Title
Economic Development Access Program; bonded projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 531 (effective 3/16/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1973ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102699D-E |
2017-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1973E |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17102699D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Counties Cities and Towns
Economic Development
Emergency Legislation
Uncodified Legislation
Counties Cities and Towns
Economic Development
Emergency Legislation
Uncodified Legislation