VA HB1971 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1971
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; reasonable accommodations; disability-related requests for parking. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Fair Housing Law, when a person receives a request for accessible parking to accommodate a disability, the person receiving the request shall treat such request as a request for reasonable accommodation. Virginia Fair Housing Law; reasonable accommodations; disability-related requests for parking. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Fair Housing Law, when a person receives a request for accessible parking to accommodate a disability, the person receiving the request shall treat such request as a request for reasonable accommodation.
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; reasonable accommodations, disability-related requests for parking.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021 | |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1971ER) |
2021-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 22-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1971H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103166D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103166D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102343D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1971 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)