VA HB1971 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Fair Housing Law; reasonable accommodations; disability-related requests for parking. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Fair Housing Law, when a person receives a request for accessible parking to accommodate a disability, the person receiving the request shall treat such request as a request for reasonable accommodation. Virginia Fair Housing Law; reasonable accommodations; disability-related requests for parking. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Fair Housing Law, when a person receives a request for accessible parking to accommodate a disability, the person receiving the request shall treat such request as a request for reasonable accommodation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Fair Housing Law; reasonable accommodations, disability-related requests for parking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (77-Y 22-N)
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1971H1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103166D-H1
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103166D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102343D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1971
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1971+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1971H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103166D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103166.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1971F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1971FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1102V0046+HB1971
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0053+HB1971
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1259+HB1971
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0128+HB1971

Bill Comments

feedback