VA HB1970 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Exemplary Teacher Grant Fund established. Creates the Exemplary Teacher Grant Fund to award grants on a competitive basis to any exemplary teacher in a public elementary or secondary school who subsequently accepts an offer for employment in a critical teaching shortage area as defined in the Board of Education's Regulations Governing the Determination of Critical Teacher Shortage Areas. The bill requires any exemplary teacher applying for a grant from the Fund to (i) agree to a three-year employment contract in the critical teacher shortage area,(ii) develop a program for mentoring other teachers in the school in which the exemplary teacher is employed, and(iii) serve as a mentor in the mentoring program that he develops.
Title
Exemplary Teacher Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102370D |