VA HB197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and middle schools; student growth assessments. Requires the Board of Education, in implementing the through-year growth assessment system for the administration of reading and mathematics assessments in grades three through eight, to seek input and suggestions from each interested local school division in the Commonwealth regarding ways in which the administration of such assessments and the reporting of assessment results can be improved, and shall, to the extent possible, incorporate such input and suggestions into the through-year growth assessment system. Public elementary and middle schools; student growth assessments. Requires the Board of Education, in implementing the through-year growth assessment system for the administration of reading and mathematics assessments in grades three through eight, to seek input and suggestions from each interested local school division in the Commonwealth regarding ways in which the administration of such assessments and the reporting of assessment results can be improved, and shall, to the extent possible, incorporate such input and suggestions into the through-year growth assessment system.
Title
Through-year growth assessment system; BOE to seek & incorporate input & suggestions into system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 156 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB197ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB197H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105622D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105622D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100344D |