VA HB197 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; financial literacy objectives; mathematics Standards of Learning; report. Requires the Department of Education to determine and report to the General Assembly no later than December 1, 2020, the feasibility of incorporating the Board of Education's student financial literacy objectives into the appropriate pre-high school mathematics Standards of Learning.
Title
Financial literacy objectives; DOE to determine feasibility of incorporating into mathematics SOL.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101217D |