VA HB1969 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1969

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Administration of blighted and derelict properties in certain localities. Modifies the definition of "qualifying locality" to include any locality with a score of 100 or higher on the fiscal stress index, as published by the Department of Housing and Community Development in July 2020. Under current law, a qualifying locality is one with a score of 107 or higher on the fiscal stress index, as published by the Department using revised data for 2017. Qualifying localities are able to (i) classify blighted and derelict properties as a separate class of taxable property and assess such property at a higher rate and (ii) sell delinquent tax lands six months after the locality has incurred abatement costs for buildings that have been condemned, constitute a nuisance, are a derelict building, or are declared to be blighted. The bill adds qualifying localities to the list of localities that have different requirements for having a special commissioner appointed to convey tax-delinquent real estate to the locality in lieu of a public sale at auction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administration of blighted and derelict properties; modifies definition of "qualifying locality."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1969ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateRead third time
2021-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Finance (17-Y 5-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2021-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102356D

Same As/Similar To

HB1969 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813221.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5813970.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1969
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1969+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1969ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0408+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1969F161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1969FER161+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1001C0004+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H10C0031+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1298+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0179+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0033+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0072HB1969+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0100HB1969+HB1969

Bill Comments 750

feedback