VA HB1969 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School boards; unexpended local funds. Requires all sums derived from local funds unexpended by a school board in any year to remain a part of the funds of the school board for use the next year. Under current law, such sums are required to remain a part of the funds of the governing body that appropriated the funds to the school board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards; unexpended local funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102185D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback