VA HB1969 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Small Business Jobs Grant Fund Program. Reduces from 50 percent to 35 percent the minimum percentage of revenues that a small business must derive from out-of-state sources in order to be eligible for grants from the Small Business Jobs Grant Fund Program. The bill reduces from $100,000 to $50,000 the minimum new capital investment that a company is required to make to be eligible for assistance under the Program. Finally, the bill changes the definition of small business for purposes of the Program from a company that has 250 or fewer employees to one that has 50 or fewer employees in its base year and average annual gross receipts of $3 million or less averaged over the previous 24-month period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Jobs Grant Fund Program; reduces minimum percentage of revenues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
2017-03-03 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1969ER)
2017-02-20HouseEnrolled
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27HousePrinted as engrossed 17100307D-E
2017-01-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1969E
2017-01-27HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-27HouseRead second time
2017-01-26HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100307D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221611(n/a)See Bill Text
221615(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1969
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1969+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1969E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1969ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0264+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0010+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0027+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0049+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1695+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0155+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB1969+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0597HB1969+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0598HB1969+HB1969
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0599HB1969+HB1969

Bill Comments 750

feedback