VA HB1969 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sewage disposal systems; civil penalties. Allows localities to use a properly licensed contractor working on behalf of the locality to issue civil summonses for certain violations related to sewage disposal systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sewage disposal systems; locality to use licensed contractor to issue civil summonses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-04 House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
2011-02-02 House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote
2011-01-28 House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
2011-01-27 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-01-27 House: Motion to refer to committee agreed to
2011-01-26 House: Passed by for the day
2011-01-26 House: Committee amendment agreed to
2011-01-26 House: Read second time
2011-01-25 House: Passed by for the day
2011-01-24 House: Read first time
2011-01-21 House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (12-Y 9-N)
2011-01-19 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
2011-01-17 House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100589D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522122(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback