VA HB1968 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; early in person; availability on Sundays. Permits the electoral board or general registrar of a county or city to provide absentee voting in person in the office of the general registrar or voter satellite office on Sundays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; availability on Sundays in office of general registrar or voter satellite office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102134D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242701.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback