VA HB1967 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School meals; availability at no cost to students. Provides that each school board shall require each public elementary and secondary school in the local school division to participate in the federal National School Lunch Program and the federal School Breakfast Program administered by the U.S. Department of Agriculture or in the Community Eligibility Provision as provided in relevant law, if applicable, and to make lunch and breakfast available to any student who requests such a meal at no cost to the student, unless the student's parent has provided written permission to the school board to withhold such a meal from the student. The bill also repeals provisions of law relating to the federal School Breakfast Program and to school meal debt that are rendered obsolete by the aforementioned provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School meals; availability at no cost to student.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Education
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2023-01-23HouseAssigned Education sub: K-12
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102774D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.3(n/a)See Bill Text
221207.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
22179.7(n/a)See Bill Text
22179.7:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback