VA HB1967 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Jobs Investment Program and Fund; minimum wage requirements. Adjusts the minimum entry-level wage rate per hour a company is required to pay in order to be eligible for assistance under the Virginia Jobs Investment Program from at least 1.35 times the federal minimum wage to 1.2 times the federal minimum wage or the Virginia minimum wage, whichever is higher.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Jobs Investment Program and Fund; minimum wage requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
2021-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-20HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseReported from General Laws (17-Y 3-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102094D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222240.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback