VA HB1966 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Sports betting; mandatory permit issuance to certain casino operators. Requires the Director of the Virginia Lottery to issue a permit to operate a sports betting platform to a casino operator that meets certain criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports betting; mandatory permit issuance to certain casino operators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-21 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseStricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 1-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101921D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5814032(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback