VA HB1965 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Virginia Real Estate Transaction Recovery Fund. Clarifies the eligibility requirements for citizens to make a claim under either the Virginia Contractor Transaction Recovery Fund or the Virginia Real Estate Transaction Recovery Fund and conforms the provisions of the Virginia Real Estate Transaction Recovery Fund to the provisions of the Virginia Contractor Transaction Recovery Fund. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Contractor and Real Estate Transaction Recovery Funds; conforms provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1965ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1965H1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103962D-H1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103962D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103434D |