VA HB1963 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Medical Assistance Services; services for individuals with developmental disabilities; financial flexibility; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to take steps to amend the Family and Individual Supports, Community Living, and Building Independence waivers to provide greater financial flexibility to individuals with developmental disabilities who are receiving waiver services. The bill requires the Department to report on its progress to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individuals with developmental disabilities; financial flexibility, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
2023-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1963ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-16SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-02-03HouseRead first time
2023-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2023-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2023-01-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104079D

Same As/Similar To

SB945 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1963
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1963+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1963ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0701+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1963F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1963FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1201V0003+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0032+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0205V0009+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H02V0049+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1487+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S04V0293+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0423+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB1963+HB1963
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0679HB1963+HB1963

Bill Comments

feedback