VA HB1963 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1963
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cooperative local health budget; report. Provides that funding for local health departments shall consist of such state funds as may be allocated for the operation of the local health department together with local matching funds and estimated self-generated local service revenues, the total amount of which shall constitute the cooperative local health budget available to a local department of health, and that the amount of local matching funds for which a county or city is responsible shall be based on the county's or city's revenue generation capacity factor, as defined in the bill; in no case, however, shall the amount of local matching funds required be greater than 45 percent or less than 18 percent of the total amount of the cooperative local health budget for the local health department that serves the county or city, after deducting estimated self-generated local service revenues. The bill directs the Department of Health to biennially review the local matching fund amount for each county and city, determine whether such amount should be revised as a result of changes to the county's or city's revenue generation capacity, and report the results of such review and any recommendations for changes to a county's or city's local matching fund amount to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Funding local health departments; cooperative local health budget, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Candi Mundon King [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1963ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102417D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1963 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)