VA HB1962 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1962
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care; termination of parental rights; relatives and fictive kin. Requires local departments of social services and licensed child-placing agencies to involve in the development of a child's foster care plan the child's relatives and fictive kin who are interested in the child's welfare. The bill requires that a child 12 years of age or older be involved in the development of his foster care plan; under current law, a child's involvement is mandatory upon reaching 14 years of age. The bill contains other amendments to provisions governing foster care and termination of parental rights that encourage the placement of children with relatives and fictive kin. Foster care; termination of parental rights; relatives and fictive kin. Requires local departments of social services and licensed child-placing agencies to involve in the development of a child's foster care plan the child's relatives and fictive kin who are interested in the child's welfare. The bill requires that a child 12 years of age or older be involved in the development of his foster care plan; under current law, a child's involvement is mandatory upon reaching 14 years of age. The bill contains other amendments to provisions governing foster care and termination of parental rights that encourage the placement of children with relatives and fictive kin.
Title
Foster care; termination of parental rights, relatives and fictive kin.
Sponsors
Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1962H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103967D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103967D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102613D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1962 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 281 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 283 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 910.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |