VA HB1962 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Education Improvement Scholarships tax credit. Increases the Education Improvement Scholarships tax credit from 65 percent to 90 percent of the value of donations made to nonprofit scholarship foundations, beginning in taxable year 2018.
Title
Education improvement scholarships; increases tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Engrossment refused by House |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102561D |