VA HB1958 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; County of Chesterfield. Corrects or repeals numerous outdated provisions and makes technical amendments to the County of Chesterfield charter. Other changes include (i) eliminating provisions relating to the departments of budget and management, accounting, and fire and replacing a listing of these and other county departments with a general statement that provides, in part, that the board of supervisors, in consultation with the county administrator, may create or abolish existing departments; (ii) eliminating various requirements related to appointment of a committee on the future and replacing it with an authorization to appoint committees as the board deems advisable; and (iii) providing that once a public facility has been determined to be in substantial accord with the county's comprehensive plan or is shown on the public facilities plan, then additional property for such facility may be added without submittal and approval and that "small cell" telecommunications facilities shall be exempt from certain requirements for substantial accord approval if the facilities are located within a zoning district where such use is either permitted by right or permitted with restrictions.
Title
Chesterfield County; amending charter, corrects or repeals outdated provisions, technical amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 382 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1958ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1958H1 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104301D-H1 |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104301D-H1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102728D |