VA HB1957 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Children in need of services; disposition; certification by parent that firearms are reasonably secure. Provides that if a child is found to be in need of services or a status offender, the juvenile or circuit court that permits the child to remain with his parents may require the parent to certify that any firearms located in the house where such child and his parent reside are reasonably secure as to prevent such child's access.
Title
Children in need of services; disposition, certification by parent that firearms are secure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102626D |