VA HB1954 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Power of Attorney Act; breach of fiduciary duty; recovery of attorney fees. Provides that in a judicial proceeding brought under the Uniform Power of Attorney Act commenced on or after July 1, 2019, if the court finds that the agent breached his fiduciary duty, the court may award costs and expenses, including reasonable attorney fees, to be paid by the agent found in violation.
Title
Uniform Power of Attorney Act; recovery of attorney fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1954ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106751D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1954S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106751D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106751D-S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1954H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104514D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104514D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103331D |