VA HB1952 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacies; reporting of processing delays impacting patient safety; centralized or remote processing of prescriptions. Requires a pharmacy that, on average, during any one-week period is unable to process a prescription within two days of receipt of such prescription to report the prescription backlog to the Board of Pharmacy. The bill requires any pharmacy making such report to submit a corrective action plan detailing its staffing, workflow, technology, and patient communication strategies to address the prescription backlog. The bill permits the Board to (i) investigate any reported or suspected backlog; (ii) accept, amend, or reject a corrective action plan; and (iii) impose disciplinary action against the pharmacy permit for failure to comply with the bill. Additionally, the bill allows pharmacies to perform centralized or remote processing of prescriptions in accordance with regulations promulgated by the Board. The bill directs the Board to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. Pharmacies; reporting of processing delays impacting patient safety; centralized or remote processing of prescriptions. Requires a pharmacy that, on average, during any one-week period is unable to process a prescription within two days of receipt of such prescription to report the prescription backlog to the Board of Pharmacy. The bill requires any pharmacy making such report to submit a corrective action plan detailing its staffing, workflow, technology, and patient communication strategies to address the prescription backlog. The bill permits the Board to (i) investigate any reported or suspected backlog; (ii) accept, amend, or reject a corrective action plan; and (iii) impose disciplinary action against the pharmacy permit for failure to comply with the bill. Additionally, the bill allows pharmacies to perform centralized or remote processing of prescriptions in accordance with regulations promulgated by the Board. The bill directs the Board to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Pharmacies; reporting of processing delays impacting patient safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Recommitted to Education and Health |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106992D-S1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103915D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3434.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3434.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |