VA HB1952 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Campaign finance; prohibited personal use; child care exception. Prohibits Campaign finance; prohibited personal use; child care exception. Prohibits any person from converting any moneys, securities, or like intangible personal property contributed to a candidate or a candidate's campaign committee to his personal use, the personal use of the candidate, or the personal use of a member of the candidate's immediate family. Current law prohibits such conversion of contributions to personal use specifically with regard to disbursement of surplus funds at the dissolution of a campaign or political committee. The bill provides that a contribution is considered to have been converted to personal use if the contribution, in whole or in part, is used to fulfill any commitment, obligation, or expense that would exist irrespective of the person's seeking, holding, or maintaining public office but excepts from "personal use" the ordinary and accepted expenses related to campaigning for or holding elective office, including the use of campaign funds to pay for the candidate's child care expenses that are incurred as a direct result of campaign activity. The bill directs the Attorney General to issue an advisory opinion explaining the provisions of the Campaign Finance Disclosure Act of 2006 (§ 24.2-945 et seq.) that prohibit the personal use of campaign funds. The bill directs the State Board of Elections to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and to provide an updated summary of Virginia campaign finance law that reflects the Attorney General's opinion and any new regulations promulgated by the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance; prohibited personal use, child care exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100991D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242948.4(n/a)See Bill Text
242948.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback