VA HB1951 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Common-law crime of suicide. Abolishes the common-law crime of suicide. Suicide is currently a common-law crime in Virginia, although there is no statutorily prescribed punishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suicide; abolishes the common-law crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (66-Y 34-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 5-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100986D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18216.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback