VA HB1951 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid match preference for Virginia businesses. Provides a bid match preference for Virginia business. Under the bill, a Virginia business has an opportunity to match the lowest bid of an out-of-state bidder if the bid of a Virginia business is within five percent of the lowest bid of an out-of-state bidder.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid match preference for Virginia businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101532D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1951 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1951+hil |