VA HB1949 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-30 - Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (6-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-30 - Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (6-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
County food and beverage tax; referendum. Provides that a county shall not hold a referendum proposing the imposition of a food and beverage tax more often than every three years.
Title
County food and beverage tax; referendum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-30 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (6-Y 12-N) (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-30 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Counties, Cities and Towns (6-Y 12-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102447D |