VA HB1948 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-18 - Read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement officer; duty to render aid; duty to report wrongdoing by another law-enforcement officer. Requires any law-enforcement officer on duty who witnesses another person suffering from a serious bodily injury or a life-threatening condition to render aid and makes it a duty to report acts of wrongdoing, defined in the bill and including bias-based profiling, committed by another law-enforcement officer on duty. Any law-enforcement officer who fails to render such aid or report such wrongdoing committed by another law-enforcement officer shall be subject to disciplinary action, including dismissal, demotion, suspension, or transfer of the law-enforcement officer. The bill also expands the definition of "bias-based profiling," a practice banned for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, other local law-enforcement officers, and State Police officers in the performance of their official duties, to include sexual orientation and gender identity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officer; duty to render aid, duty to report wrongdoing by another officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-18HouseRead first time
2021-01-15HouseReported from Public Safety (15-Y 6-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2021-01-13HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102665D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521704.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521704.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback