VA HB1943 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1943
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable Gaming Board; regulations; electronic pull tabs. Prohibits the Charitable Gaming Board from promulgating regulations that prohibit the use of multiple video monitors or touchscreens on an electronic pull tab device and provides that the use of electronic pull tab devices utilizing multiple video monitors or touchscreens shall be limited to one player at a time.
Title
Charitable Gaming Board; regulations, electronic pull tabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 14 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021 | |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1943ER) |
2021-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 33-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 33-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1943H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103309D-H1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103309D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101234D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1943 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
SB1287 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
SB1287 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
SB1287 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
SB1287 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)