VA HB1942 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1942
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public adjusters; continuing education. Provides for continuing education requirements for public adjusters and that the insurance continuing education board (the Board), appointed by the State Corporation Commission, is responsible for establishing and monitoring standards for such requirements. Currently, the Commission is given such responsibility and the Board is responsible for the continuing education requirements for other insurance agents and agencies. The bill maintains the current requirement that a public adjuster complete a minimum of 24 hours of approved credits, including three hours of ethics, on a biennial basis.
Title
Public adjusters; continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101074D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1942 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1845.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1866 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1867 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1868.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1869 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1871 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1873 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |