VA HB1942 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fostering Futures program; background check. Requires any individual participating in the Fostering Futures program to undergo a background check, which includes submitting to fingerprinting and a national criminal history record check. The bill provides that the results of such background check shall be used for the sole purpose of determining whether other children should be placed or remain in the same foster home as the individual subject to the background check. The bill defines "individual participating in the Fostering Futures program" as a person who is 18 years of age or older but has not reached 21 years of age and is receiving foster care services through the Fostering Futures program.
Title
Fostering Futures program; individual participating in program subject to a background check.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1942ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101366D |