VA HB1941 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Maiming, etc., of another; driving while intoxicated; operating watercraft while intoxicated; penalties. Increases from a Class 6 felony to a Class 4 felony the punishment for a person who, as a result of driving while intoxicated or operating a watercraft or motorboat while intoxicated in a manner so gross, wanton, and culpable as to show reckless disregard for human life, unintentionally causes the serious bodily injury, as defined in the bill, of another person resulting in permanent and significant physical impairment. The bill creates a Class 6 felony for such driving or operation that unintentionally causes the serious bodily injury, as defined in the bill, of another person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving while intoxicated or operating watercraft while intoxicated; maiming, etc., of another.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1941ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: McDougle, Stuart, Edwards
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Bell, Robert B., Collins, Bourne
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute with amendment rejected by House 19106787D-S1 (1-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1941S1
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106787D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106787D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 1-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102606D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18251.4(n/a)See Bill Text
18251.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1941
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1941+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1941S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1941ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0465+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0116+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0113+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2460+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0261+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0383+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB1941+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB1941+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3207+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB1941+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1085HB1941+HB1941
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3327+HB1941

Bill Comments

feedback