VA HB1940 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child Pornography Registry; contents of Registry; criminal investigations; report. Requires copies of all known or suspected child pornography found during the course of a criminal investigation of child pornography offenses to be included in the Child Pornography Registry (the Registry). Current law provides that only such images that are presented as evidence and used in a conviction for child pornography offenses are required to be included in the Registry. The bill also provides that Registry information may be used for victim identification. The bill requires the Department of State Police, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to submit a report detailing the implementation plan for changes to the Registry pursuant to the bill to the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and Senate Committee on Finance by January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to SB 1379.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Pornography Registry; contents of Registry, criminal investigations, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
2019-02-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 14, 2019
2019-02-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 7, 2019
2019-02-06SenateSigned by President
2019-02-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1940ER)
2019-02-06HouseEnrolled
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateRead third time
2019-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102421D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192390.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback