VA HB1940 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-15)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-15)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder in individuals from age two through age 10. Currently, such coverage is required to be provided for individuals from age two through age six. The provision applies with respect to insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on or after January 1, 2016. The measure does not apply to policies, contracts, or plans issued in the individual market or the small group market, which effective January 1, 2016, will include employers with no more than 100 employees.
Title
Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1940ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (79-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Worker's Compensation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1940H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 15104921D-H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute from Commerce and Labor rejected 15104850D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104921D-H2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104850D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103387D |