VA HB194 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB194
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Board for Community Colleges; degree completion agreements; plan and framework. Requires the State Board for Community Colleges to develop and distribute to each comprehensive community college, no later than December 31, 2020, a plan and framework for agreements between two or more comprehensive community colleges that would facilitate associate degree completion by enhancing access to coursework at each such institution through online education and other innovative distance education methods.
Title
Community Colleges, State Board for; degree completion agreements, plan and framework.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101228D |
Same As/Similar To
HB194 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote