VA HB194 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Competency and sanity evaluations; capital murder; audiovisual recording. Requires any evaluator evaluating a defendant's competency to stand trial or sanity to make an audiovisual recording of any interview conducted with a defendant charged with capital murder. The bill provides further that the recording shall be confidential and made available only to any other evaluator appointed by a court or obtained by a defendant for the purposes of evaluating the defendant's competency or sanity.
Title
Competency and sanity evaluations; capital murder, audiovisual recording.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100599D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 169.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 169.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB194 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB194+hil |