VA HB1939 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Powers of local authorities; reducing speed limits; highways in the primary and secondary state highway systems. Authorizes the governing body of any locality to reduce to less than 25 miles per hour, but not less than 15 miles per hour, the speed limit of highways that are part of the primary and secondary state highway systems located in a business district or residence district within the locality's boundaries, provided that the reduced speed limit is indicated by lawfully placed signs. Current law only authorizes the governing body of a locality that maintains its own roads to make such a reduction on highways in a business district or residence district within the locality's boundaries.
Title
Primary and secondary state highway systems; reducing speed limits on highways part of system.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103064D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Motor Vehicles
Speed Limits
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Motor Vehicles
Speed Limits