VA HB1938 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Blind or vision impaired; definition. Amends the definition of "blind person" in conformance with the definition set forth by the Social Security Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blind or vision impaired; definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1938ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101808D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51560(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback