VA HB1938 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Slingbow hunting; license. Authorizes the use of a slingbow to hunt deer and small game when a hunter is licensed to hunt with a bow and arrow.
Title
Slingbow hunting; authorizes use to hunt small and big game.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1938ER) |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1938ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103783D-E |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1938E |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103783D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 285 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 303.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 521.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 524 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 528.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 549 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |