VA HB1936 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Robbery; penalties. Creates degrees of punishment corresponding to the severity of a robbery offense. Any person who commits a robbery and causes serious bodily injury to or the death of another person is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using or displaying a firearm in a threatening manner is guilty of a Class 3 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using physical force not resulting in serious bodily injury, or by using or displaying a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a threatening manner, is guilty of a Class 5 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using threat or intimidation not involving a deadly weapon is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Under current law, any robbery is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for life or any term not less than five years. Robbery; penalties. Creates degrees of punishment corresponding to the severity of a robbery offense. Any person who commits a robbery and causes serious bodily injury to or the death of another person is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using or displaying a firearm in a threatening manner is guilty of a Class 3 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using physical force not resulting in serious bodily injury, or by using or displaying a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a threatening manner, is guilty of a Class 5 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using threat or intimidation not involving a deadly weapon is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Under current law, any robbery is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for life or any term not less than five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Robbery; penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HousePending question ordered
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1936H1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103380D-H1
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103380D-H1
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101411D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18258(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1936
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1936+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1936H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103380D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103380.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1936F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1936F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1936FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1936FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0025+HB1936
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0036+HB1936
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0118+HB1936
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1296+HB1936
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0144+HB1936

Bill Comments

feedback