VA HB1933 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Medical and mental health treatment of prisoners incapable of giving consent. Establishes a process for the sheriff or administrator in charge of a local or regional correctional facility to petition a court to authorize medical or mental health treatment for a prisoner in such facility who is incapable of giving informed consent for such treatment. The process parallels the existing process for the Director of the Department of Corrections to seek authorization to provide involuntary treatment to prisoners in state correctional facilities. The bill requires the court to authorize such treatment in a facility designated by the sheriff or administrator upon finding that the prisoner is incapable, either mentally or physically, of giving informed consent; that the prisoner does not have a relevant advanced directive, guardian, or other substitute decision maker; that the proposed treatment is in the best interests of the prisoner; and that the jail has sufficient medical and nursing resources available to safely administer the treatment and respond to any adverse side effects that might arise from the treatment. The bill provides that the treatment ordered may be provided within a local or regional correctional facility if such facility is licensed to provide such treatment. If statutory procedures are followed, the service provider does not have liability based on lack of consent or lack of capacity to consent unless there is injury or death resulting from gross negligence or willful and wanton misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners; medical and mental health treatment of those incapable of giving consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1933ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-12SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-12SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-30SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1933H1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104834D-H1
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104834D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100189D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171406(n/a)See Bill Text
171410(n/a)See Bill Text
372803(n/a)See Bill Text
531133.04(n/a)See Bill Text
531133.05(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1933
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1933+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1933H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1933ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0007+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0012+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1854+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0181+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0094+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1933+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0520HB1933+HB1933
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2830+HB1933

Bill Comments

feedback