VA HB1933 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lyme disease; disclosure of information to patients. Requires physicians to provide to each patient for whom a test for the presence of Lyme disease is ordered a written notice about Lyme disease, about testing for Lyme disease, and about the need for the patient to contact his physician with questions or concerns about Lyme disease. The bill also provides that licensees are immune from civil liability for providing such notice absent gross negligence or willful misconduct. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2018.
Title
Lyme disease; written information to patient when ordering laboratory test for presence of disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (56-Y 40-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 215 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1933ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (56-Y 40-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105259D-S1 (56-Y 40-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Pending question ordered |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1933S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105259D-S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105259D-S1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13104654D-EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1933EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment by Delegate Stolle agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104654D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104654D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #1 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102771D |