VA HB1932 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Yielding or reducing speed for stationary vehicles; vehicles displaying hazard lights, caution signs, or road flares. Requires drivers to make a lane change or reduce speed when passing stationary vehicles that have activated the vehicular hazard warning signal flashers, displayed caution signs, or been marked with properly lit flares or torches on certain highways when safe and reasonable to do so and makes a violation of this requirement a traffic infraction.
Title
Stationary vehicles; yielding or reducing speed for vehicles displaying hazard lights, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 616 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1932ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102790D |
Same As/Similar To
SB982 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
SB982 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
SB982 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)