VA HB1931 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil commitment of sexually violent predators; penalty. Creates a Class 6 felony for any civilly committed sexually violent predator who tampers with or in any way attempts to circumvent the operation of his GPS equipment while on conditional release.
Title
Sexually violent predators; civil commitment, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1931ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106925D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1931S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106925D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106925D-S1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100767D |
Same As/Similar To
SB973 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
SB973 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
SB973 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)