VA HB193 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Control Act; Schedule I; Schedule II; Schedule IV; Schedule V. Adds certain chemicals to the Drug Control Act. The Board of Pharmacy has added these substances in an expedited regulatory process. A substance added via this process is removed from the schedule after 18 months unless a general law is enacted adding the substance to the schedule.
Title
Drug Control Act; adds certain chemicals to the Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 114 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB193ER) |
2022-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 11-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB193H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105088D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105088D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101731D |
Same As/Similar To
SB759 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
SB759 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
SB759 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)