VA HB1929 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Campaign finance; disclosure of all out-of-state contributors. Requires all campaign finance reports to itemize each contributor who is not a resident of Virginia and disclose certain information regardless of the amount of the contribution. Current disclosure laws continue to apply for (i) contributions from residents of Virginia that are $100 or less in the aggregate and (ii) contributions that are in excess of $100 in the aggregate, regardless of the residency of the contributor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance; disclosure of all contributors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 7-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 41-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1929H1
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (52-Y 47-N)
2019-01-30HouseMotion to pass by amendments #2-5 by Delegate Simon agreed to (52-Y 47-N)
2019-01-30HouseSpeaker ruled amendment #1 by Delegate Simon not germane
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105057D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105057D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101750D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242947.4(n/a)See Bill Text
242949.5(n/a)See Bill Text
242949.9:1(n/a)See Bill Text
242949.9:2(n/a)See Bill Text
242950.4(n/a)See Bill Text
242951.3(n/a)See Bill Text
242952.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback