VA HB1929 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public-Private Transportation Act; comprehensive agreement. Requires all comprehensive agreements originally entered into on or after July 1, 2017, resulting in privately funded roads open for public transportation to include a provision requiring funding for adequate staffing, defined in the bill, for general law-enforcement services by the Virginia State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-Private Transportation Act; comprehensive agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
2017-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1929ER)
2017-02-28HouseEngrossed bill reprinted 17103562D-E
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1929ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-27HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 17103562D-E
2017-01-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1929E
2017-01-26HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-01-26HouseRead second time
2017-01-25HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103562D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3321808(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1929
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1929+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1929E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1929ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0511+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1903V0002+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H19V0028+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1667+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0125+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB1929+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB1929+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB1929+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB1929+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2597+HB1929

Bill Comments 750

feedback